Del Carmen Romero v. Leyva et al
Plaintiff: Graciela Del Carmen Romero
Defendant: Joaquin Leyva and P.S.O.B., INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00683
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:207
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Joaquin Leyva, P.S.O.B., INC.. (Attachments: #1 P.S.O.B. Inc. Summons)(dl)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Graciela Del Carmen Romero. (Attachments: #1 Leyva Summons)(Bocchini, Anna)
July 3, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
July 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12314604), filed by Graciela Del Carmen Romero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit FLSA Consent)(Bocchini, Anna) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/8/2019 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Carmen Romero v. Leyva et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joaquin Leyva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.S.O.B., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Graciela Del Carmen Romero
Represented By: Anna Bocchini
Represented By: Rebecca Clare Eisenbrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?