Williams v. Department of Defense
Petitioner: Christona Williams
Respondent: Department of Defense, Office of the Inspector General and Department of Defense
Case Number: 1:2019cv00686
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 12:3410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Strike #4 Reply to Response to Motion by Department of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parnham, Thomas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Department of Defense. (Parnham, Thomas)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Christona Williams, re MOTION Protection re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Christona Williams A-19-CV-686-AA (Timmons, Sean)
July 29, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred MOTION Protection re #1 MOTION to Quash. Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dm)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING [] Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's objections to subpoena is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Andy Austin for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Department of Defense, re MOTION Protection re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Movant Christona Williams (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Ronaldo Abueg, #3 Berryman v. Dep't of Defense, No. 5:16-MC-004-RP (W.D. Tex. Apr. 20, 2016))(Parnham, Thomas)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr on behalf of Department of Defense. Attorney Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr added to party Department of Defense(pty:res) (Parnham, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 MOTION for Protection to Customer Challenge Provisions of the Right to Financial Privacy Act of 1978 contained within #1 Complaint by Christona Williams. (dl) Modified to update title of motion on 7/9/2019 (cj).
July 8, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
July 8, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - OBJECTIONS TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM TO USAA FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK AND MOTION FOR ORDER 1:19-cv-00686 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12318029). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Christona Williams. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sworn Statement, #2 Proposed Order Order Restricting Government's Access to Financial Records, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet)(Timmons, Sean) Modified on 7/8/2019 to correct event (dl). (Attachment 4 replaced and flattened on 7/9/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Defense, Office of the Inspector General
Represented By: Laura Winstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Department of Defense
Represented By: Laura Winstead
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Christona Williams
Represented By: Sean Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?