Doe v. Strategic Partnerships, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Strategic Partnerships, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00695
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jane Doe as to Strategic Partnerships, Inc.. Waiver sent on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (Eisenbrey, Rebecca)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to proceed under a pseudonym. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Strategic Partnerships, Inc.. (dl)
July 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jane Doe. (dl)
July 9, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
July 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eisenbrey, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jane Doe. (Eisenbrey, Rebecca)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12327465), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eisenbrey, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Strategic Partnerships, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Partnerships, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Rebecca Clare Eisenbrey
Represented By: Anna Bocchini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?