Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC et al v. City of Kyle, Texas
Plaintiff: Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC and Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: City of Kyle, Texas
Case Number: 1:2019cv00734
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of Kyle, Texas, re #25 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of Kyle, Texas (Powers, Matthew)
September 17, 2019 Motion Hearing reset for 10/2/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman re: #25 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss , #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (cj).
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RESETTING HEARING re #22 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
September 16, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, re #25 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of Kyle, Texas (Kroger, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 25 Supplemental MOTION to Dismiss by City of Kyle, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sept 9 2019 unsigned ordinance, #2 Exhibit B - Disposition Table)(Powers, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 24 Subject to its Motion to Dismiss, ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Kyle, Texas.(Powers, Matthew)
September 11, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, Plaintiff Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC (Kroger, William)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Hearing. Hearing set for 9/17/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
September 6, 2019 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of Kyle, Texas, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant City of Kyle, Texas (Powers, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by City of Kyle, Texas, re #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, Plaintiff Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC (Powers, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, Plaintiff Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC (Kroger, William)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, re #14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant City of Kyle, Texas (Kroger, William)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant shall respond to the Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment on or before September 5, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Kyle, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Powers, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by City of Kyle, Texas, re #13 MOTION for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, Plaintiff Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC (Powers, Matthew)
August 27, 2019 Filing 15 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by City of Kyle, Texas, re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, Plaintiff Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC (Powers, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Kyle, Texas. (Powers, Matthew)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Hearing by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Setting Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kroger, William)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Bill Kroger, #2 Exhibit 2 - Original Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Chart)(Kroger, William)
August 12, 2019 City of Kyle, Texas answer on or before 8/20/2019. (cj)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes August 20, 2019. Its deadline to respond to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction is extended to and include August 27, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Extension of time to respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by City of Kyle, Texas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time)(Powers, Matthew)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC. City of Kyle, Texas served on 7/23/2019, answer due 8/13/2019. (Kroger, William)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/17/2019 01:00 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney James H. Barkley for Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC,James H. Barkley for Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to City of Kyle, Texas. (cj)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC. (Kroger, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC. (Kroger, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William Karl Kroger for James Barkley ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12377999) by on behalf of Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kroger, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC, Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kroger, William)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to James H. Barkley for Plaintiffs Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC et al re: non-admitted status. (cj)
July 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
July 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12377486), filed by Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC, Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - F, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kroger, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC et al v. City of Kyle, Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinder Morgan Texas Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: William Karl Kroger
Represented By: Thomas R. Phillips
Represented By: Gavin R. Villareal
Represented By: James H. Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Permian Highway Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: William Karl Kroger
Represented By: Thomas R. Phillips
Represented By: Gavin R. Villareal
Represented By: James H. Barkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kyle, Texas
Represented By: Mary A. Keeney
Represented By: Matthew C. Powers
Represented By: Guillermo A. Alarcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?