Contreras v. City of Austin
Plaintiff: Jeff Contreras
Defendant: City of Austin and John Jarrell
Case Number: 1:2019cv00744
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to John Jarrell. (lt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeff Contreras. John Jarrell (Melton, John) (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/16/2019 to flatten form) (lt).
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Jarrell amending, filed by Jeff Contreras.(Melton, John)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jeff Contreras, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Defendant City of Austin (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melton, John)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
August 23, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Jeff Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melton, John)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Vacation by City of Austin (Matula, Paul)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 ATTACHMENT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint Proposed Order by City of Austin. (Matula, Paul) Modified on 9/12/2019 to correct docket text(lt).
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by City of Austin. (Matula, Paul)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; City of Austin answer on or before 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of Austin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matula, Paul)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeff Contreras. City of Austin served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Melton, John)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to City of Austin. (cj)
July 24, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Jeff Contreras. (cj)
July 24, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
July 24, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Jeff Contreras. (Melton, John) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 7/24/2019) (cj).
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jeff Contreras. (Melton, John) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 7/24/2019) (cj).
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12389234), filed by Jeff Contreras.(Melton, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. City of Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Contreras
Represented By: John F. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Austin
Represented By: Paul Matula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Jarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?