Stamper v. Bluebonnet Trails Community Services et al
Plaintiff: Julie Stamper
Defendant: Jonathan Lemuel and Bluebonnet Trails Community Services
Case Number: 1:2019cv00749
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #8 Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, this motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Jonathan Lemuel amending, filed by Julie Stamper.(Melton, John)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' late reply, filed on September 11, 2019, in support of their Motion to Compel Arbitration #7 is accepted by this Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to #11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Jonathan Lemuel. (Helfand, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Jonathan Lemuel, re #7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Defendant Jonathan Lemuel Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Helfand, William)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration by Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Jonathan Lemuel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Helfand, William)
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Julie Stamper, re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Defendant Jonathan Lemuel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melton, John)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Julie Stamper, re #7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Defendant Jonathan Lemuel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Proposed Order)(Melton, John)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Jonathan Lemuel. (Helfand, William)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Jonathan Lemuel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Helfand, William)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Stamper. Jonathan Lemuel served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Melton, John)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Julie Stamper. Bluebonnet Trails Community Services served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Melton, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bluebonnet Trails Community Services, Jonathan Lemuel. (cj)
July 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Julie Stamper. (cj)
July 25, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
July 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Julie Stamper. Defendant Lemuel (Melton, John) (Main Document 3 replaced and flattened on 7/25/2019) (cj).
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Julie Stamper. Defendant Bluebonnet (Melton, John) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 7/25/2019) (cj).
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12395345), filed by Julie Stamper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Melton, John) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 7/25/2019) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stamper v. Bluebonnet Trails Community Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Lemuel
Represented By: William Scott Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluebonnet Trails Community Services
Represented By: William Scott Helfand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Stamper
Represented By: Michael Balcezak
Represented By: John F. Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?