Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Defendant: State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts
Case Number: 1:2019cv00758
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Reset Answer Deadlines: State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts answer due 10/3/2019. (afd)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant must respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before October 3, 2019. This is Defendant's third request for an extension. Should Defendant request another extension, even if unopposed, Defendant will need to provide the Court with additional information explaining the need for more time. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Third Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint by State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint)(Saarinen, Lynn)
September 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts answer due 9/19/2019. (lt)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes September 19, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(ld)
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Saarinen, Lynn)
August 22, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts answer due 9/5/2019. (td)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or to otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to and includes September 5, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Answer Deadline)(Saarinen, Lynn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts served on 8/1/2019, answer due 8/22/2019. (James, Bruce)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts. (cj)
July 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
July 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (James, Bruce) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 7/29/2019) (cj).
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(James, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/5/2019: #13 Unredacted Complaint, #14 Civil Cover Sheet & Copy of Summons, #15 Exhibit 1, #16 Exhibit 2, #17 Exhibit 3, #18 Exhibit 4 (not submitted), #19 Exhibit 5 (13 pages missing), #20 Exhibit 6, #21 Exhibit 7, #22 Exhibit 8, #23 Exhibit 9, #24 Exhibit 10, #25 Exhibit 11) (td). (Attachment 18 replaced on 8/7/2019) (td).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation v. State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Represented By: Bruce H. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas, Office of the Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By: Lynn E. Saarinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?