Tellez-Moncada et al v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Alma Hernandez and Kristal Tellez-Moncada
Defendant: Covenant Transport, Inc., Convenient Transport, Inc. and Joshua Ryan Taylor
Case Number: 1:2019cv00823
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James R Nowlin
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/14/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge James R. Nowlin, ADR Report Deadline due by 11/25/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 11/22/2019, Discovery due by 1/21/2020, Joinder of Parties due by 11/22/2019, Motions due by 2/28/2020,. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (dm)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Scheduling Order AMENDED by Alma Hernandez, Kristal Tellez-Moncada. (Edwards, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Scheduling Order CORRECTED by Alma Hernandez, Kristal Tellez-Moncada. (Edwards, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #4 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. ***PLEASE NOTE: This document was filed in the wrong case. Correction has been made. No further action is required. (dm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 **FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD. Proposed Scheduling Order by Alma Hernandez, Kristal Tellez-Moncada. (Edwards, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/15/2019 (dm).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
August 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alma Hernandez, Kristal Tellez-Moncada. (dl)
August 20, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
August 20, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Covenant Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12502011), filed by Covenant Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Index of State Court File, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #6 Exhibit Exhibit A-3 - Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition, #7 Exhibit Exhibit A-4 - Return of Service on Convenient Transport, Inc., #8 Exhibit Exhibit A-5 - Return of Service on Joshua Ryan Taylor, #9 Exhibit Exhibit A-6 - Return of Service on Covenant Transport, Inc., #10 Exhibit Exhibit A-7 - Convenient Transport, Inc.'s Email Answer, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A-8 - Covenant Transport, Inc.'s Original Answer, #12 Exhibit Exhibit A-9 - Joshua Ryan Taylor's Original Answer, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B - Convenient Transport, Inc.'s Consent to Removal, #14 Exhibit Exhibit C - Joshua Taylor's Consent to removal)(Wright, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tellez-Moncada et al v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covenant Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Convenient Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Ryan Taylor
Represented By: Michael C. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Singley
Represented By: Scott Medlock
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Edwards
Represented By: David Anthony James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristal Tellez-Moncada
Represented By: Michael Singley
Represented By: Scott Medlock
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Edwards
Represented By: David Anthony James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?