KBFA Investment Group, Inc. v. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Defendant: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Petitioner: KBFA Investment Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00846
Filed: August 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINAL JUDGMENT ORDERED that the Arbitration Award signed May 30, 2019 is CONFIRMED. ORDER that the case is hereby CLOSED. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING FedEx's #11 Motion to Enforce Judgment and Application to Confirm Arbitration Award. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (klw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc., re #11 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Application to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Respondent Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (Gagnon, Joseph)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by KBFA Investment Group, Inc., re #11 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Application to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Respondent Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Charnitski, Jonathan)
September 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and Application to Confirm Arbitration Award by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Gagnon, Joseph)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Response to Plaintiff's Notice of Petition and Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Gagnon, Joseph)
September 23, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. answer due 9/30/2019. (dm)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge James R. Nowlin. Defendant Fedex Ground Package System Inc's answer is now due on or before September 30, 2019.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (gc)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Complaint by Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gagnon, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KBFA Investment Group, Inc.. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Charnitski, Jonathan)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.. (dm)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KBFA Investment Group, Inc.. (Charnitski, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Fedex Ground Package System, Inc. (dl)
August 29, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
August 29, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by KBFA Investment Group, Inc.. (Charnitski, Jonathan)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12541081), filed by KBFA Investment Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Charnitski, Jonathan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12538863), filed by KBFA Investment Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Charnitski, Jonathan) Modified on 8/29/2019 because Plaintiff originally filed Complaint with a Motion to Seal. Complaint has been refiled (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KBFA Investment Group, Inc. v. Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fedex Ground Package System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KBFA Investment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan W. Charnitski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?