Mendoza et al v. Round Rock Independent School District
Plaintiff: Ivette Mendoza and David Ortega
Defendant: Round Rock Independent School District and YMCA of Greater Williamson County
Case Number: 1:2019cv00860
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Round Rock Independent School District.(Marzec, Philip)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to YMCA of Greater Williamson County. (lt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ivette Mendoza, David Ortega. (Cirkiel, Martin)
October 29, 2019 Notice of Correction: re #7 , #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The summons cannot be issued as filed. Please complete the form, print/save as a PDF, and resubmit. (lt)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ivette Mendoza, David Ortega. (Cirkiel, Martin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Ivette Mendoza, David Ortega. (Cirkiel, Martin)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Round Rock Independent School District, YMCA of Greater Williamson County amending, filed by David Ortega, Ivette Mendoza.(Cirkiel, Martin)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Round Rock Independent School District as to Round Rock Independent School District. Waiver sent on 9/3/2019, answer due 11/4/2019. (Marzec, Philip)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Anthony O'Hanlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Anthony O'Hanlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100036838) on behalf of Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Proposed Order)(lt)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Anthony O'Hanlon for Plaintiffs re: non-admitted status. (cj)
September 3, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ivette Mendoza, David Ortega. (cj)
September 3, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
September 3, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12554157). No Summons requested at this time, filed by C.O., David Ortega, Ivette Mendoza.(Cirkiel, Martin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. Round Rock Independent School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivette Mendoza
Represented By: Martin J. Cirkiel
Represented By: Anthony O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ortega
Represented By: Martin J. Cirkiel
Represented By: Anthony O'Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Round Rock Independent School District
Represented By: R. Darin Darby
Represented By: Philip Marzec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YMCA of Greater Williamson County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?