Grassroots Leadership v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Grassroots Leadership
Defendant: U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv00872
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Set Answer Deadlines: U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement answer due 11/11/2019. (afd)
September 19, 2019 Set Deadlines: U.S. Department of Homeland Security answer due 11/11/2019. (afd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grassroots Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Natarajan, Ranjana)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grassroots Leadership. Grassroots Leadership served on 9/12/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Natarajan, Ranjana) Modified answer due date on 9/19/2019 (afd).
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(dl)
September 9, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
September 9, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Grassroots Leadership. (Natarajan, Ranjana)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive and Declaratory Relief ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12579370). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Grassroots Leadership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Natarajan, Ranjana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grassroots Leadership v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grassroots Leadership
Represented By: Ranjana Natarajan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigrations and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?