Strong Jackson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Melissa Jo Strong Jackson
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv00909
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Request for US Marshals Service Expenses in the amount of $46.80. (lt)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Andrew Saul served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (lt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lt)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT, filed by Melissa Jo Strong Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Interested Persons)(lt)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDER for the Clerk to issue summons in this case and the United States Marshals Service to attempt service in this case without pre-payment of a service fee. Signed by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (lt)
September 16, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin.. Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (dl)
September 16, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Melissa Jo Strong Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Persons)(Kelly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong Jackson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Jo Strong Jackson
Represented By: Michael Thomas Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?