Burke v. Davis
Petitioner: Russell Lee Burke
Respondent: Director Lorie Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00927
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lorie Davis answer due 11/25/2019. (td)
October 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Mark Lane. Answer is due on or before November 25, 2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Lorie Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (Cosper, Craig)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig W. Cosper on behalf of Lorie Davis. Attorney Craig W. Cosper added to party Lorie Davis(pty:res) (Cosper, Craig)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Respondent to Answer #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Russell Lee Burke. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Roy G. Romo. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (td)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Roy G. Romo ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 100036862) by Russell Lee Burke. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Receipt #100036862). Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (afd)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5; receipt number 100036861), filed by Russell Lee Burke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt #100036861)(afd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burke v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Russell Lee Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward L. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?