United States of America v. Lakeway Regional Medical Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: G. Edward Alexander, John Prater, SDP of Austin Enterprises, LLC, Surgical Development Partners, LLC, Frank Sossi and Lakeway Regional Medical Center, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00945
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: James R Nowlin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; G. Edward Alexander answer due 12/13/2019; Lakeway Regional Medical Center, LLC answer due 12/13/2019; John Prater answer due 12/13/2019; SDP of Austin Enterprises, LLC answer due 12/13/2019; Frank Sossi answer due 12/13/2019; Surgical Development Partners, LLC answer due 12/13/2019.; GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge James R. Nowlin. (dm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Buffone, Samuel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to All Defendants. (Parnham, Thomas)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James R. Nowlin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel J. Buffone, Jr on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Samuel J. Buffone, Jr added to party United States of America(pty:pla) (Buffone, Samuel)
September 25, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (lt)
September 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lt)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parnham, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lakeway Regional Medical Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Edward Alexander
Represented By: Jeff Cody
Represented By: Barton Wayne Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Prater
Represented By: Jeff Cody
Represented By: Barton Wayne Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDP of Austin Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Jeff Cody
Represented By: Barton Wayne Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surgical Development Partners, LLC
Represented By: Jeff Cody
Represented By: Barton Wayne Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Sossi
Represented By: Jeff Cody
Represented By: Barton Wayne Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeway Regional Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Jeff Cody
Represented By: Barton Wayne Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Susan Leslie Strawn
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel J. Buffone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?