Sissom v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Susan Sissom
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Malcolm Cisneros, a law corporation and MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps
Case Number: 1:2019cv00949
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE, filed by Susan Sissom, re #10 MOTION to Dismiss [for Dismissal] Without Prejudice Pursuant to Texas Property Code 51.007 filed by Defendant MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps, Defendant Malcolm Cisneros, a law corporation (lt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps, Malcolm Cisneros, a law corporation, re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Susan Sissom (Steinmark, Michael)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss [for Dismissal] Without Prejudice Pursuant to Texas Property Code 51.007 by MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps, Malcolm Cisneros, a law corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice)(Steinmark, Michael)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon, re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Susan Sissom (Bautista, Lishel)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to the Court of Improper Procedure by Susan Sissom (lt)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Susan Sissom. (lt)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 State Court Records Filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Bautista, Lishel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF STATE COURT ANSWER AND CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Malcolm Cisneros, a law corporation, MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Answer and Verified Denial filed 9/23/2019)(Steinmark, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Bautista, Lishel)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the removal with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Directing Rebekkah B. Bodoff to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
September 27, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
September 27, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a America's Wholesale Lender, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12660418), filed by The Bank of New York Mellon f/k/a The Bank of New York, Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a America's Wholesale Lender, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Bautista, Lishel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sissom v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Lishel May Bautista
Represented By: Rebekkah B. Bodoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Lishel May Bautista
Represented By: Rebekkah B. Bodoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Cisneros, a law corporation
Represented By: J. Garth Fennegan
Represented By: Michael R. Steinmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc. dba Trustee Corps
Represented By: J. Garth Fennegan
Represented By: Michael R. Steinmark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Sissom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?