United States of America v. Austin Tele-Services Partners, LP
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Austin Tele-Services Partners, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00956
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America as to Austin Tele-Services Partners, LP. Waiver sent on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Parnham, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Austin Tele-Services Partners, LP. (dm)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by United States of America. (Parnham, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by United States of America. (dl)
September 30, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
September 30, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parnham, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Austin Tele-Services Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Tele-Services Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?