Stross v. Lynn et al
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Defendant: Vicky Lynn, Does 1-10 and MoxiWorks, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01022
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Vicky Lynn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss)(Davila, Sergio)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MoxiWorks, LLC. (td)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default Application for Entry of Default against Defendant Moxiworks, LLC by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jenny S. Kim Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Jenny S. Kim Declaration)(Kim, Jenny)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alexander Bayonne Stross #6 Summons Issued, SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. Vicky Lynn served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Kim, Jenny)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. MoxiWorks, LLC served on 11/5/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Tehranian, John)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Vicky Lynn, MoxiWorks, LLC. (cj)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alexander Bayonne Stross. Revised Summons to Vicky Lynn and (Attachments: #1 Supplement Revised Summons to MoxiWorks)(Tehranian, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Jenny Kim re: non-admitted status. (cj)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights, along with a copy of the Complaint. (cj)
October 18, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (cj)
October 18, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
October 18, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alexander Bayonne Stross. Summons to Vicky Lynn and (Attachments: #1 Supplement Summons to MoxiWorks)(Tehranian, John)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement and Falsification of Copyright Management Information and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12745351), filed by Alexander Bayonne Stross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tehranian, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stross v. Lynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Lynn
Represented By: Sergio R. Davila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MoxiWorks, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Bayonne Stross
Represented By: John Tehranian
Represented By: Jenny S. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?