Hirsch v. Owen et al
Plaintiff: STEVEN HIRSCH
Defendant: DOUGLAS WILLIAM OWEN, OWEN MEDIA GROUP LLC, Does 1 Through 10 Inclusive and Owen Media Group
Case Number: 1:2019cv01037
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Hirsch (Higbee, Mathew)
November 26, 2019 MOTION REFERRED: referred #9 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Answer. Referral Judge: Andrew W. Austin. (td)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Matthew Kidman Higbee: re #9 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Answer. (td)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #9 Motion to Strike entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike, (Dkt. 9), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Andrew Austin for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld)
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Answer by Steven Hirsch. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Higbee, Mathew)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Douglas William Owen, Owen Media Group (pleading not signed).(td) Modified on 11/4/2019 (td).
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Hirsch. Owen Media Group served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Higbee, Mathew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Hirsch. Douglas William Owen served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Higbee, Mathew)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Douglas William Owen, Owen Media Group. (dl)
October 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Steven Hirsch. (dl)
October 23, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
October 23, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by STEVEN HIRSCH. (Higbee, Mathew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by STEVEN HIRSCH. for Douglas William Owen (Attachments: #1 Summons for Owen Media Group)(Higbee, Mathew)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12763034). No Summons requested at this time, filed by STEVEN HIRSCH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Higbee, Mathew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirsch v. Owen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS WILLIAM OWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OWEN MEDIA GROUP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Media Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN HIRSCH
Represented By: Mathew Kidman Higbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?