APL Microscopic, LLC v. Greene Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: APL Microscopic, LLC
Defendant: Greene Technologies, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01044
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that APL shall move for default judgment against Greene within three weeks of being served with the Clerks entry of default against Greene (should that occur). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Greene Technologies, LLC (cj)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Rothman, Joel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Entry of Default against Greene Technologies, LLC by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joel B. Rothman, #2 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Rothman, Joel)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED ORDER that APL shall either move for clerks entry of default anddefault judgment against Greene or file a status report with the Court on or before December 19,2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that Order, #8 , is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VACATED per order #9 ORDERED that APL shall move for entry of default and default judgment against Greene on or before December 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by APL Microscopic, LLC. Greene Technologies, LLC served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Rothman, Joel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Greene Technologies, LLC. (dl)
October 25, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by APL Microscopic, LLC. (dl)
October 25, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
October 25, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Rothman, Joel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright by APL Microscopic, LLC re #1 Complaint, (Rothman, Joel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Rothman, Joel)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement (Injunctive Relief Demanded) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12771633), filed by APL Microscopic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Registration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Infringement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Rothman, Joel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APL Microscopic, LLC v. Greene Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: APL Microscopic, LLC
Represented By: Joel Benjamin Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?