Mithril Capital Management LLC v. McKellar
Plaintiff: Mithril Capital Management LLC
Defendant: Crystal Scripps McKellar
Case Number: 1:2019cv01086
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall notify the court immediately upon any action taken by the Northern District of California that may affect this case. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
January 27, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Mithril Capital Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit #1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Holscher, Mark)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Exhibits. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
January 21, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Crystal Scripps McKellar Amended Certificate of Service to #21 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Shelton, Ian)
January 21, 2020 Filing 22 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #21 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (dm)
January 17, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Attachments: #1 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit B-1, #2 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit B-2, #3 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit C, #4 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit D, #5 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit E, #6 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit F, #7 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit G, #8 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit H, #9 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit I, #10 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit J, #11 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit K, #12 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit L, #13 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit M, #14 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit N, #15 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit O, #16 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit P, #17 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit Q, #18 Sealed Document Sealed Exhibit V, #19 Proposed Order) (Shelton, Ian)
January 17, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant's Motion to Stay the Action, or Alternatively to Dismiss the Action for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Improper Venue, or Alternatively to Transfer the Action to the Northern District of California, San Francisco Division by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Crystal McKellar, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1 (Sealed), #5 Exhibit B-2 (Sealed), #6 Exhibit C (Sealed), #7 Exhibit D (Sealed), #8 Exhibit E (Sealed), #9 Exhibit F (Sealed), #10 Exhibit G (Sealed), #11 Exhibit H (Sealed), #12 Exhibit I (Sealed), #13 Exhibit J (Sealed), #14 Exhibit K (Sealed), #15 Exhibit L (Sealed), #16 Exhibit M (Sealed), #17 Exhibit N (Sealed), #18 Exhibit O (Sealed), #19 Exhibit P (Sealed), #20 Exhibit Q (Sealed), #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V (Sealed), #26 Exhibit W, #27 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Ian) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2020: SEALED #28 Exhibit B-1, #29 Exhibit B-2, #30 Exhibit C, #31 Exhibit D, #32 Exhibit E, #33 Exhibit F, #34 Exhibit G, #35 Exhibit H, #36 Exhibit I, #37 Exhibit J, #38 Exhibit K, #39 Exhibit L, #40 Exhibit M, #41 Exhibit N, #42 Exhibit O, #43 Exhibit P, #44 Exhibit Q, #45 Exhibit V) (jv2).
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Crystal Scripps McKellar answer due 1/17/2020. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Rebekah Sills; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 100037319. (dm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by Mark C. Holscher; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 100037320. (dm)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE regarding motion for admission pro hac vice of Mark Holscher and Rebekah Sills by Mithril Capital Management LLC re #13 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 Notice of Appearance, #11 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Rotman, Anna)
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anna Rotman on behalf of Mithril Capital Management LLC. Attorney Anna Rotman added to party Mithril Capital Management LLC(pty:pla) (Rotman, Anna)
November 21, 2019 Filing 14 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Shelton, Ian)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rebekah Suzanne Sills. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Second Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Ian)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark C. Holscher. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebekah Sills on behalf of Mithril Capital Management LLC. (dm)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Holscher on behalf of Mithril Capital Management LLC. (dm)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Crystal Scripps McKellar answer due 11/22/2019. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant Crystal McKellar by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shelton, Ian)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for David A. Baay to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Crystal Scripps McKellar. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ian Scott Shelton Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David A. Baay ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12824399) by on behalf of Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Shelton, Ian)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Orders Directing David Andrew Baay, Mark Holscher, and Rebekah Sills to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crystal Scripps McKellar (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12821302), filed by Crystal Scripps McKellar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Docket Report), #2 Exhibit B-1 (Texas State Court Petition), #3 Exhibit B-2 (Letter Requesting Issuance of Citation), #4 Exhibit B-3 (Citation), #5 Exhibit B-4 (Return of Service), #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Shelton, Ian)
November 7, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 7, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mithril Capital Management LLC v. McKellar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Scripps McKellar
Represented By: Catherine Elise Garza
Represented By: Ian Scott Shelton
Represented By: David Andrew Baay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mithril Capital Management LLC
Represented By: Mark Holscher
Represented By: Rebekah Sills
Represented By: Mark C. Holscher
Represented By: Anna Rotman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?