Allman v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Allman fka Weaver and Ruth Ann Allman
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A. and Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01090
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew W Austin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. entered by Judge Andrew W. Austin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bh)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney of Record by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution). Motions referred to Judge Andrew W. Austin. (Alexander, Tatiana)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING all pending and future discovery motions as well as allother nondispositive motions to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin for resolution. ORDER REFERRING all pending and future dispositive motions to Magistrate Judge Andrew W. Austin for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dl)
November 11, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (dl)
November 11, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC . (Manning, Matt)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Bank of America, N.A., Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Salim, Murad)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12829028), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC, Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Supplement)(Catalano, Frank) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/12/2019 to flatten image) (dl). (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/12/2019 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allman v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Frank J. Catalano
Represented By: Murad Salim
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Represented By: Tatiana Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Frank J. Catalano
Represented By: Matt Delmore Manning
Represented By: Murad Salim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Allman fka Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Ann Allman
Represented By: E. Jason Billick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?