CipherLoc Corporation v. De La Garza et al
Plaintiff: CipherLoc Corporation
Defendant: MSR, LLC, Michael De La Garza and James LaGanke
Case Number: 1:2019cv01147
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CipherLoc Corporation. MSR, LLC served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Francis, Dwight)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Michael De La Garza, James LaGanke, MSR, LLC. (td)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CipherLoc Corporation. (Francis, Dwight)
November 22, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
November 22, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12886435), filed by CipherLoc Corporation.(Francis, Dwight) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/25/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CipherLoc Corporation v. De La Garza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael De La Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LaGanke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CipherLoc Corporation
Represented By: Dwight M. Francis
Represented By: Aimee C. Oleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?