Midkiff v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Kristy Midkiff
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01192
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER ADOPTING #97 Report and Recommendation and Awarding Attorney's Fees, Litigation Expenses, and Post-Judgment Interest.. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
November 12, 2021 Filing 103 Reply in Support of #98 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jv2)
November 12, 2021 Motion No Longer Referred: #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (jv2)
November 5, 2021 Filing 102 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kristy Midkiff, re #100 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America / Plaintif's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Reply In Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation (Jalali, Azin)
November 4, 2021 Filing 101 BILL OF COSTS against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jv2)
November 4, 2021 Filing 100 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Reply In Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply In Support of Objections to Report and Recommendation)(Kamps, Julie)
October 28, 2021 Filing 99 RESPONSE / P's Response to Defendant's Objections to the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge to #98 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Kristy Midkiff. (Jalali, Azin)
October 14, 2021 Filing 98 OBJECTION to #97 Report and Recommendations by Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Objection to R&R, #2 Exhibit - TABLE 5 - Analysis of Plaintiff's post-Fee Motion Fees)(Kamps, Julie)
September 30, 2021 Filing 97 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of United States Magistrate Judge re #88 Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs, filed by Kristy Midkiff. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (jv2)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REFERRING #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Kristy Midkiff to United States Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell for Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
June 24, 2021 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kristy Midkiff, re #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiff Kristy Midkiff (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees and Costs, #2 Declaration of Kristy Midkiff in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs)(Jalali, Azin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 94 ATTACHMENT "(Proposed Order)" to #92 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,, by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kamps, Julie)
June 10, 2021 Filing 93 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #92 Response in Opposition to Motion (jv2)
June 10, 2021 Filing 92 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, re #88 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Plaintiff Kristy Midkiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Response Exhibit A - Lex Machina Statistics for ERISA cases filed by Bemis, Roach & Reed, #2 Exhibit - Response Exhibit B - Lex Machina Statistics for ERISA cases filed by Berg Plummer Johnson & Raval, LLP, #3 Exhibit - Response Exhibit C - Declaration of James L. Johnson, #4 Exhibit - Response Exhibit D - Chavez v. Standard - Memorandum and Order, #5 Exhibit - Response Exhibit E - Affidavit of Lonnie Roach, #6 Exhibit - Response Exhibit F - 2015 Hourly Rate Fact Sheet, #7 Table 1 - Excessive, Redundant, or Otherwise Unnecessary Entries, #8 Table 2 - Vague and Block Billed Entries, #9 Table 3 - Clerical and Paralegal Entries, #10 Table 4 - Entries Related to Prudentials Motion to Transfer)(Kamps, Julie)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING #89 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadlines. Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs is due 06/10/2021. Plaintiff's reply is due 06/24/2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
May 27, 2021 Filing 90 ATTACHMENT - Proposed Order to #89 Stipulation by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kamps, Julie)
May 26, 2021 Filing 89 STIPULATION Extending Deadlines To File Response And Reply To Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees and Costs by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kamps, Julie)
May 20, 2021 Filing 88 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Kristy Midkiff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman, #2 Declaration of Azin Jalali, #3 Declaration of Amar Raval, #4 Declaration of Bernard Guerrini, #5 Declaration of Daniel Feinberg, #6 Declaration of Lee Harris, #7 Proposed Order)(Jalali, Azin)
May 20, 2021 Filing 87 BILL OF COSTS by Kristy Midkiff. (Jalali, Azin)
May 6, 2021 Filing 86 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER DENYING Defendant's #81 Motion for Amended or Additional Findings Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure 52(b), 59(a)(2), and 59(e). Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
April 27, 2021 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, re #81 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company Of Americas Reply To Plaintiffs Response To Defendants Motion For Amended Or Additional Findings Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure 52(b), 59(a)(2), And 59(e)) (Kamps, Julie)
April 21, 2021 Filing 83 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Kristy Midkiff, re #81 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman)(Jalali, Azin)
April 16, 2021 Filing 82 STIPULATION / Joint Stipulation As To Amount Of Benefits And Interest by Kristy Midkiff. (Jalali, Azin)
April 16, 2021 Filing 81 MOTION (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of Americas Motion For Amended Or Additional Findings Pursuant To Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure 52(b), 59(a)(2), And 59(e)) re #79 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie) Modified on 4/16/2021 (jv2).
April 8, 2021 Filing 80 STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Submit Calculations of Benefits by Kristy Midkiff. (Jalali, Azin)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. IT IS ORDERED that the parties submit a joint stipulation consistent with these findings of fact and conclusions of law by April 9, 2021. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DISMISSING #62 Motion for Summary Judgment; DISMISSING #64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
November 20, 2020 Filing 77 Proposed Findings of Fact by Kristy Midkiff. (Jalali, Azin)
November 20, 2020 Filing 76 Proposed Findings of Fact by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kamps, Julie)
November 9, 2020 Filing 75 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Bench Trial held by Video completed on 11/9/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (jv2)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's #72 Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial. ORDER VACATING the Court's prior ORDER #71 and SETTING this matter for Bench Trial to be conducted by ZOOM for 11/6/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
October 13, 2020 Filing 73 DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #72 MOTION to Continue (EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) (jv2)
October 12, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Continue (EMERGENCY MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Morrison, Ian)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ***VACATED*** ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL TO BE CONDUCTED REMOTELY VIA ZOOM on 10/16/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. ORDER VACATING #57 Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) Modified on 10/13/2020 (jv2).
September 14, 2020 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.) (jv2)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER SETTING Telephone Conference for 9/14/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
August 21, 2020 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Kristy Midkiff, re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion For Judgment On The Administrative Record And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support filed by Plaintiff Kristy Midkiff (Attachments: #1 Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law on Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record)(Jalali, Azin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 67 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company Of Americas Motion For Summary Judgment) filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company Of Americas Reply In Further Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment) (Kamps, Julie)
August 7, 2020 Filing 66 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Kristy Midkiff, re #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company Of Americas Motion For Summary Judgment) filed by Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America / Plaintiff's Response To Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment (Jalali, Azin)
August 7, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, re #64 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion For Judgment On The Administrative Record And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support filed by Plaintiff Kristy Midkiff (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company Of Americas Response To Plaintiffs Motion For Judgement On The Administrative Record) (Kamps, Julie)
July 25, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment / Plaintiffs Motion For Judgment On The Administrative Record And Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support by Kristy Midkiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jalali, Azin)
July 24, 2020 Filing 63 APPENDIX to #62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company Of Americas Motion For Summary Judgment) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America's Motion For Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tamika Williams, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of William DeNitzio, #4 Exhibit D - Administrative Record, Part 1, #5 Exhibit D - Administrative Record, Part 2, #6 Exhibit D - Administrative Record, Part 3, #7 Exhibit D - Administrative Record, Part 4, #8 Exhibit D - Administrative Record, Part 5, #9 Exhibit D - Administrative Record, Part 6)(Kamps, Julie)
July 24, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company Of Americas Motion For Summary Judgment) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kamps, Julie)
July 6, 2020 Filing 61 STIPULATION Extending Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Kamps, Julie)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING #59 Motion to Extend Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
June 30, 2020 Filing 59 Joint MOTION to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines (Joint Motion To Extend Dispositive Motion Deadine) by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie)
April 22, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF REPRESENTATION by Prudential Insurance Company of America (Kamps, Julie)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ***VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DKT. NO. 71*** SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Lee Yeakel, ADR Report Deadline due by 4/17/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 7/10/2020. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2) Modified on 9/15/2020 (jv2).
April 16, 2020 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/16/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(jv2)
April 9, 2020 Filing 55 ADR Report Filed - Joint Alternative Dispute Resolution Report by Kristy Midkiff(Jalali, Azin)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING Initial Pretrial Conference for 4/16/2020 at 09:30 AM by Telephone before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
March 17, 2020 Filing 53 Proposed Scheduling Order by Kristy Midkiff. (Jalali, Azin)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER GRANTING #51 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie M. Kamps. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
January 15, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie M. Kamps ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13078756) by on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bar Admissions of Julie M. Kamps, #2 Proposed Order)(Kamps, Julie)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Terrence J. Coleman. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Azin Jalali. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
December 20, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ian H. Morrison on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America. Attorney Ian H. Morrison added to party Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft) (Morrison, Ian)
December 19, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amar B. Raval on behalf of Kristy Midkiff. Attorney Amar B. Raval added to party Kristy Midkiff(pty:pla) (Raval, Amar)
December 18, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amar B. Raval on behalf of Azin Jalali ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12984273) by on behalf of Kristy Midkiff. (Raval, Amar)
December 18, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amar B. Raval on behalf of Terrence J. Coleman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-12984219) by on behalf of Kristy Midkiff. (Raval, Amar)
December 6, 2019 Filing 44 Case Transfer and Opening Letter mailed to all Counsel. (cj)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Orders Directing Charles Kelechi Chineduh, Terrence J.Coleman, Azin Jalali, Jason A. James, Linda Marie Lawson, and Ryan Hideki Opgenorth to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (cj)
December 6, 2019 Filing 42 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of California; Case Number 4:19-cv-01656.
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #33 Motion to Transfer Case. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
December 6, 2019 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
December 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 19, 2019 Filing 40 REPLY (re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) ) filed byPrudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Defendant's Motion to Transfer)(James, Jason) (Filed on 11/19/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
November 14, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 11/20/2019 10:00 AM., at the law offices of Pillsbury & Coleman LLP, 100 Green Street, San Francisco, CA 94111. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE AT MEDIATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/13/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 38 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) ) filed byKristy Midkiff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Terrence J. Coleman In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America's Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order)(Jalali, Azin) (Filed on 11/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER DENYING #35 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION; AND APPROVING #32 STIPULATION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/4/19. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Request for Relief that the November 14, 2019 Mediation Completion Deadline be Continued Pending Resolution re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a)) filed by Kristy Midkiff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 11/1/2019) Modified on 11/4/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Request for Relief that the November 14, 2019 Mediation Completion Deadline be Continued Pending Resolution re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a); Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Responses due by 11/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason A. James, #2 Proposed Order)(James, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 Request for Judicial Notice re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Related document(s) #33 ) (James, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a); Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 09:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Responses due by 11/12/2019. Replies due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tamika Williams in Support of Prudential's Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Tamika Williams, #3 Declaration of Jason A. James in Support of Prudential's Motion, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jason A. James, #5 Proposed Order)(James, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
October 28, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION REGARDING THE STANDARD OF REVIEW AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE filed by Kristy Midkiff, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Jalali, Azin) (Filed on 10/28/2019) Modified on 10/29/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Terrence J. Coleman for Pillsbury & Coleman, LLP, Attorneys for Plaintiff, Kristy Midkiff (Coleman, Terrence) (Filed on 10/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Prudential Insurance Company of America, Kristy Midkiff. (James, Jason) (Filed on 8/30/2019) Modified on 9/3/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 29 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing C. Mark Humbert as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #27 Stipulation selecting Mediation. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Prudential Insurance Company of America filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, Krity Midkiff. (James, Jason) (Filed on 8/22/2019) Modified on 8/23/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey S. White: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/16/2019. Consent/Declination due by 8/30/2019. Stipulation re: Mediation process due by 8/23/2019. Total Time in Court: 17 minutes. Court Reporter: Pamela Batalo Hebel. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Azin Jalali (Jalali, Azin) (Filed on 8/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Kelechi Chineduh (Chineduh, Charles) (Filed on 8/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 23 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, Kristy Midkiff. (James, Jason) (Filed on 8/9/2019) Modified on 8/12/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #21 Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference.Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/16/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue the Case Management Conference filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America, Kristy Midkiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(James, Jason) (Filed on 6/26/2019) Modified on 6/27/2019 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Opgenorth, Ryan) (Filed on 6/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (James, Jason) (Filed on 6/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ryan Hideki Opgenorth (Opgenorth, Ryan) (Filed on 6/12/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Other Affiliate Prudential Financial, Inc. for Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Lawson, Linda) (Filed on 6/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint byPrudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason) (Filed on 6/5/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/16/19. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Jeffrey S. White. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 13 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Prudential Insurance Company of America.. (James, Jason) (Filed on 5/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristy Midkiff. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Quirk, Michael) (Filed on 5/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 6, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]* Re-File as Summons Returned Executed*Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #9 Certificate of Service filed by Kri sty Midkiff (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 *Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kristy Midkiff / Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint (Quirk, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2019) Modified on 5/6/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint [L.R. 6-1] By Not More Than 30 Days filed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (James, Jason) (Filed on 4/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kristy Midkiff.. (Quirk, Michael) (Filed on 4/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Prudential Insurance Company of America. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/15/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kristy Midkiff (Quirk, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Quirk, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR RECOVERY OF EMPLOYEE BENEFITS UNDER ERISA 29 U.S.C. 1132(a)(1)(B) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13217378.). Filed byKristy Midkiff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Quirk, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midkiff v. Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Jason A. James
Represented By: Charles Kelechi Chineduh
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Represented By: Julie M. Kamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Midkiff
Represented By: Azin Jalali
Represented By: Ryan Hideki Opgenorth
Represented By: Terrence J. Coleman
Represented By: Michael James Quirk
Represented By: Amar B. Raval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?