Henslee et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Charlene A. Henslee and Donald G Henslee
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00018
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charlene A. Henslee, Donald G Henslee (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorman, Terry)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court will grant Plaintiffs' motion as unopposed. Plaintiffs shall file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. 4), by February 25, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ld)
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Brief in Support by Charlene A. Henslee, Donald G Henslee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorman, Terry) Modified on 2/18/2020 (td).
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Brief in Support by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Yow, Rebecca)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
January 6, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
January 6, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
January 6, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Yow, Rebecca)
January 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13037203), filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henslee et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene A. Henslee
Represented By: Terry P. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald G Henslee
Represented By: Terry P. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?