DGG Group, LLC v. Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC
Plaintiff: DGG Group. LLC and DGG Group, LLC
Defendant: Sinbad Foods, LLC and Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Counter Plaintiff: Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00330
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Office: Austin Office
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Motions No Longer Referred: #26 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (lt)
May 13, 2020 Filing 35 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC, Sinbad Foods, LLC, Fifth Third Bank, National Association, filed by DGG Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(lt)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #26 Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (lt)
May 12, 2020 Filing 33 ANSWER to #25 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by DGG Group, LLC.(Pugh, Nicholas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 32 REPLY In Support of #26 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff' s Second Amended Complaint, by DGG Group, LLC. (Pugh, Nicholas) Modified on 5/8/2020 to correct docket text and docket entry relationship. (lt)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DISMISSING as MOOT Defendant's #27 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Third-Party Subpoena. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (lt)
May 4, 2020 Filing 30 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC, re #26 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff DGG Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
May 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoena by DGG Group, LLC (Pugh, Nicholas)
April 29, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by DGG Group, LLC, re #27 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Third-Party Subpoena filed by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC (Pugh, Nicholas)
April 28, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: referred #26 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint and #27 MOTION for Protective Order MOTION to Quash Third-Party Subpoena. Referral Judge: Susan Hightower. (lt)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #27 Motion for Protective Order; REFERRING #27 Motion to Quash entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Protective Order and to Quash Third-Party Subpoena, (Dkt. 27), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order REFERRING #26 Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, (Dkt. 26), is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower for disposition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of Appendix C of the Local Rules of the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Protective Order , MOTION to Quash Third-Party Subpoena by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by DGG Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Leave, #2 Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit C to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit D to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #7 Proposed Order)(Pugh, Nicholas)
April 23, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against DGG Group, LLC by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC.(Chiarello, Katherine)
April 17, 2020 Filing 24 Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING DGG Group's #6 Motion for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Hearing held on 4/13/2020 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by DGG Group, LLC (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(lt)
April 12, 2020 Filing 21 WITNESS/EXHIBIT LIST by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC. (Saba, John)
April 11, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's Witness List for Hearing on #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction "Pre-hearing documents" by DGG Group, LLC. (Pugh, Nicholas) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lt).
April 11, 2020 Filing 19 Plaintiff's Objections to Defendant's Exhibits re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction "Pre-hearing documents" by DGG Group, LLC. (Pugh, Nicholas) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lt).
April 11, 2020 Filing 18 Plaintiff's List of Exhibits for Hearing on #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction "Pre-hearing documents" by DGG Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Pugh, Nicholas) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lt).
April 10, 2020 Filing 17 Supplement to Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC, re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff DGG Group, LLC Supplement to Response in Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6)(Saba, John) Modified on 4/13/2020 (lt).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the parties file required pre-hearing documents, if any, on or before 4/13/20 at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jg3)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Kevin John Slater to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of DGG Group, LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's #6 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, by DGG Group, LLC. (Pugh, Nicholas) Modified on 4/9/2020 to correct docket text and create docket entry relationship (lt).
April 9, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC, filed by DGG Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(lt)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #12 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiffs amended complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by DGG Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pugh, Nicholas)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicholas Adam Pugh for Kevin John Slater ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13437648) on behalf of DGG Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pugh, Nicholas) (Main Document 11 replaced on 4/8/2020 to flatten form). Modified on 4/8/2020 (lt).
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC, re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff DGG Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Saba, John)
April 7, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC answer due 4/23/2020. (lt)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John D. Saba, Jr on behalf of Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC. Attorney John D. Saba, Jr added to party Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC(pty:dft) (Saba, John)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Because Plaintiff did not file a response and because Defendant requested additional time due to the circumstances created by the COVID-19 pandemic, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 23, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Panedemic Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jg3)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING Telephonic Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Expedited Briefing Schedule re #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Hearing set for 4/13/2020 at 1:00PM before Judge Robert Pitman.. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jg3)
April 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by DGG Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pugh, Nicholas)
March 30, 2020 Filing 5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Chiarello, Katherine)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Directing Kevin John Slater to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
March 26, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
March 26, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC. (Chiarello, Katherine)
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LOCKHART FINE FOODS, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13391839), filed by LOCKHART FINE FOODS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chiarello, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DGG Group, LLC v. Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DGG Group. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DGG Group, LLC
Represented By: Kevin John Slater
Represented By: Nicholas Adam Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Lockhart Fine Foods, LLC
Represented By: Katherine Patrice Chiarello
Represented By: John D. Saba, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sinbad Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?