Mokhtar v. Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Mohamed Mokhtar
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00369
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Durell, Daniel)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Durell, Daniel)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the removing party supplement the record with state court pleadings, if it has not already done so. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
April 8, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl)
April 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Durell, Daniel)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-13438641), filed by Pennymac Loan Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplement to Civil Cover Sheet)(Durell, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mokhtar v. Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennymac Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Durell
Represented By: Benjamin David Lee Foster
Represented By: Thomas G. Yoxall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohamed Mokhtar
Represented By: Roger Alex Conant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?