Matthews v. Executive Office for the United States Attorneys et al
Plaintiff: Eric Martin Matthews
Defendant: Office of the President, Executive Office for the United States Attorneys, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Office of Legal Counsel and Office of the Judge Advocate General
Case Number: 1:2020cv00370
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Susan Hightower
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Filing CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eric Martin Matthews re #14 MOTION to Amend. (lt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Filing CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eric Martin Matthews re #13 MOTION to Suspend Proceedings. (lt)
May 6, 2020 Filing 15 Partial Filing fee received in the amount of $16.41, receipt number 100038436 (IPFF $16.41) (lt)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend Counts One and Two and Add Additional FOIA Request by Eric Martin Matthews.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (lt)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Suspend Proceedings by Eric Martin Matthews. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (lt)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 Request from U.S. Marshal Service for reimbursement of expenses in the amount of $23.70 for summons served. (lt)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2020: #1 Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint by Mail) (lt).
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (lt)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Eric Martin Matthews #75804-004. The Court has assessed that Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $16.41. ORDER that issuance of service of process shall be commenced by the United States Marshal on the United States Attorneys' Office in San Antonio, Texas, and the Attorney General of the United States at Washington, District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Susan Hightower. (lt)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Case Opening Letter mailed to Eric Martin Matthews. (cj)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Understanding by Eric Martin Matthews (cj)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Parties by Eric Martin Matthews. (cj)
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge by Eric Martin Matthews (Attachments: #1 Notices for Defendents - unsigned)(cj)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Direct United States Marshalls to Effect Service by Eric Martin Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Summons). Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (cj)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Eric Martin Matthews.. Motions referred to Judge Susan Hightower. (cj)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Eric Martin Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, Cover Letters and Envelope)(cj)
April 8, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (cj)
April 8, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Executive Office for the United States Attorneys et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the President
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Office for the United States Attorneys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Legal Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Judge Advocate General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Martin Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?