United States of America v. Board of Securities and Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John Doe, Brian Vance and Board of Securities and Financial Services
Case Number: 1:2020cv00433
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America of #7 Order (Parnham, Thomas)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING the United States' Application for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Show Cause Hearing held on 5/7/2020. Written Order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(lt)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support, filed by United States of America, re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parnham, Thomas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by United States of America. (Parnham, Thomas)
April 23, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Hearing to show cause why the preliminary injunction requested by the United States should not be granted set for 5/7/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING United States' #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. The temporary restraining order shall remain in force until May 7, 2020 at 3:15 pm. Hearing to show cause set for May 7, 2020 at 2:00pm by telephone. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Sabban Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Parnham, Thomas)
April 23, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
April 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parnham, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Board of Securities and Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Securities and Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Arthur Parnham, Jr.
Represented By: Neeraj Kumar Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?