Wilson et al v. Centene Management Company, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo and Cynthia Wilson
Defendant: Celtic Insurance Company, Centene Company of Texas, L.P., Superior HealthPlan, Inc. and Centene Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00484
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference, by phone, set for 7/14/2020 09:40 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Withdraw entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Clerk shall mark the initially filed proposed scheduling order, (Dkt. 12), as WITHDRAWN. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sw)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STATUS REPORT by Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (Fassold, Mark)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw by Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fassold, Mark)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order Agreed by Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (Fassold, Mark) Modified on 6/30/2020 (lt).
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson filed as attachment to Dkt. #13 , at 4. (lt)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WITHDRAWN PER TEXT ORDER DATED 7/1/2020Proposed Scheduling Order by Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (Fassold, Mark)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark A. J. Fassold for Kurt B. Olsen ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13696829) by on behalf of Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (Fassold, Mark)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark A. J. Fassold for Fran L. Rudich ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13696758) by on behalf of Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (Fassold, Mark)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall move for clerk's entry of default against any Defendants for whom it would be warranted or file a report apprising the Court of the status of this case on or before July 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Second Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Wilson, Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo. All Defendants. (Fassold, Mark)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Wilson, Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Centene Company of Texas Proof of Service, #2 Centene Management Company Proof of Service, #3 Superior HealthPlan Proof of Service)(Fassold, Mark)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Courts Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID19 Pandemic(ta)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to all non-admitted Counsel. (dl)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celtic Insurance Company, Centene Company of Texas, L.P., Centene Management Company, LLC, Superior HealthPlan, Inc.. (dl)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (dl)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo, Cynthia Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Watts, Mikal) (Main Document 2, Attachments 1 -3 replaced on 5/6/2020 to flatten images) (dl).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13536689), filed by Cynthia Wilson, Erin Angelo, Nicholas Angelo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watts, Mikal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Centene Management Company, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Angelo
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: Mark A. J. Fassold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Angelo
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: Mark A. J. Fassold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Wilson
Represented By: Mikal C. Watts
Represented By: Mark A. J. Fassold
Represented By: Meredith Drukker Stratigopoulos
Represented By: Andres Christian Pereira
Represented By: Francisco Guerra, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celtic Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Company of Texas, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior HealthPlan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centene Management Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?