Meyers v. 360Training.com., Inc.
Plaintiff: Breanna N. Meyers
Defendant: 360Training.com., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00551
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file their proposed agreed scheduling order 60 days after any appearance of any defendant, as prescribed by Local Rule CV-16(c). Because the parties' PSO was not yet due, this case was excepted from the blanket rule of the Second Amended Emergency Order regarding filing PSOs by July 7, 2020. The Court apologizes for its oversight and for the inconvenience to the parties. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (sh)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Proposed Scheduling Order by Breanna N. Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Klepper, Gabrielle)
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Breanna N. Meyers as to 360Training.com., Inc.. Waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Klepper, Gabrielle)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 Second Amended Emergency Order in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED EMERGENCY ORDER IN LIGHT OF THE COVID-19 PANADEMIC. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
May 21, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Breanna N. Meyers. (dl)
May 21, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
May 21, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13594232). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Breanna N. Meyers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Klepper, Gabrielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyers v. 360Training.com., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breanna N. Meyers
Represented By: Gabrielle Elizabeth Klepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360Training.com., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?