Goldsmith v. Alfavor Petroleum Corporation
Plaintiff: Scott Goldsmith
Defendant: Alfavor Petroleum Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00598
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (td)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Scott Goldsmith (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that parties file a motion to dismiss or stipulation of dismissal on or before July 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (td)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Scott Goldsmith (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Goldsmith. Alfavor Petroleum Corporation served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Alfavor Petroleum Corporation. (dl)
June 4, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Scott Goldsmith. (dl)
June 4, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (dl)
June 4, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Scott Goldsmith. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/5/2020) (dl).
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13634507). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Scott Goldsmith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 4 replaced on 6/5/2020 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldsmith v. Alfavor Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Goldsmith
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfavor Petroleum Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?