Roach v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Katherine-Marie Roach
Defendant: Elizabeth Brown and Douglas Brown
Case Number: 1:2020cv00615
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Susan Hightower
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Katherine-Marie Roach. (dm)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Susan Hightower. (dm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER and MOTION to Dismiss by Douglas Brown. (dm)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER and MOTION to Dismiss by Elizabeth Brown. (dm)
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Katherine-Marie Roach. (dm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine-Marie Roach. Elizabeth Brown served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (dm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katherine-Marie Roach. Douglas Brown served on 6/16/2020, answer due 7/7/2020. (dm)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE, Proof of Service by Katherine-Marie Roach. (dm)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Douglas Brown, Elizabeth Brown. (cj)
June 10, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Katherine-Marie Roach. (cj)
June 10, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
June 10, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100038638), filed by Katherine-Marie Roach. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt)(cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roach v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine-Marie Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?