Proimos v. Thriveworks Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Alex Proimos
Defendant: Thriveworks Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00662
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint. Thriveworks Solutions, LLC shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before 10/5/2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION for extension of time for Defendant to respond to the complaint by Alex Proimos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 8/20/2020 to change to motion event (jv2).
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Order by Alex Proimos (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights along with copy of Complaint. (dl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Thriveworks Solutions, LLC. (dl)
June 25, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Alex Proimos. (dl)
June 25, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
June 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Alex Proimos. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/25/2020 to flatten image) (dl).
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13698232). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Alex Proimos. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Attachment 3 replaced on 6/25/2020 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proimos v. Thriveworks Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thriveworks Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Proimos
Represented By: Richard Paul Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?