TriNet USA, Inc. v. Anderson
Plaintiff: TriNet USA, Inc.
Defendant: Cassandra Anderson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00756
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment, and proposed Stipulated Permanent Injunction and Final Judgment by Cassandra Anderson. (O'Carroll, Sinead)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION Regarding Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Cassandra Anderson. (O'Carroll, Sinead)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION Regarding Service and Deadline to Respond to Complaint by TriNet USA, Inc.. (Rosenwasser, Steven)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Steven J. Rossenwasser. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (dm)
July 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephanie R. Smiley for Steven J. Rossenwasser ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13785051) by on behalf of TriNet USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smiley, Stephanie)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TriNet USA, Inc.. (Smiley, Stephanie)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cassandra Anderson. (cj)
July 16, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
July 16, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by TriNet USA, Inc.. (Smiley, Stephanie)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13769470), filed by TriNet USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PIIA, #2 Exhibit B - Cease and Desist Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smiley, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TriNet USA, Inc. v. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TriNet USA, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie R. Smiley
Represented By: Steven J. Rosenwasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Anderson
Represented By: Sinead O'Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?