Assou v. The Kenan Advantage Group et al
Plaintiff: Foad Assou
Defendant: The Kenan Advantage Group, Petro Chemical Transport LLC, Ghion Tsega and Kenan Transport LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00771
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Daniel Paul Buechler added to party Kenan Transport LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Paul Buechler added to party Petro Chemical Transport LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel Paul Buechler added to party The Kenan Advantage Group(pty:dft) by Kenan Transport LLC, Petro Chemical Transport LLC, The Kenan Advantage Group.(Buechler, Daniel)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service of Process. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jv2)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Substitute Service of Process on Ghion Tsega by Foad Assou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Substitute Service of Process on Ghion Tsega)(Alexander, Syreeta)
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenan Transport LLC, Petro Chemical Transport LLC, The Kenan Advantage Group, Ghion Tsega. (jv2)
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Foad Assou. to The Kenan Advantage Group, Inc.,Kenan Transport, LLC, Petro Chemical Transport, LLC, and Ghion Tsega (Alexander, Syreeta) (Main Document 2 replaced to flatten image on 8/12/2020) (jv2). Modified on 8/12/2020 (jv2).
July 23, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Foad Assou. (dl)
July 23, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
July 23, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13789936), filed by Foad Assou. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alexander, Syreeta) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2020 to flatten image) (dl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Assou v. The Kenan Advantage Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foad Assou
Represented By: Syreeta Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kenan Advantage Group
Represented By: Daniel Paul Buechler
Represented By: Lauren Doughty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petro Chemical Transport LLC
Represented By: Daniel Paul Buechler
Represented By: Lauren Doughty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ghion Tsega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenan Transport LLC
Represented By: Daniel Paul Buechler
Represented By: Lauren Doughty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?