Kellough v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johnny Glenn Kellough
Defendant: BP America Production Company and Bp Exploration & Production, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00823
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Charles David Durkee, Nathan Lee Nelson, Scott C. Seiler, Catherine Pyune McEldowney, Devin C. Reid and Kevin Michael Hodges. (dl)
August 5, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Johnny Glenn Kellough. (dl)
August 5, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
August 5, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 Case electronically transferred in from Eastern District of Louisiana; Case Number 2:20-cv-00626.
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that the instant matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Texas (Austin Division). Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 8/4/2020. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
August 4, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Charles David Durkee to be substituted in place of Nathan Lee Nelson by Johnny Glenn Kellough. Motion(s) referred to Donna Phillips Currault. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Charles David Durkee added to party Johnny Glenn Kellough(pty:pla).(Durkee, Charles) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than JULY 3, 2020, plaintiff Johnny Glenn Kellough must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiff and his counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why plaintiff's case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the deadline by which plaintiff must submit his venue filing is extended to no later than AUGUST 3, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault on 6/3/2020. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Devin C. Reid added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(mp) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Johnny Glenn Kellough (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8164538) filed by Johnny Glenn Kellough. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Election Not to Mediate, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nathan Lee Nelson added to party Johnny Glenn Kellough(pty:pla).(Nelson, Nathan) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 8/5/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kellough v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Georgia L. Lucier
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bp Exploration & Production, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Pyune McEldowney
Represented By: Devin C. Reid
Represented By: Kevin Michael Hodges
Represented By: Georgia L. Lucier
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny Glenn Kellough
Represented By: Charles David Durkee
Represented By: Nathan Lee Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?