Zare v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Melody Zare
Counter Plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00882
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 3 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Dennis M. Lynch added to party UNUM Life Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against Melody Zare by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America.(Lynch, Dennis)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Melody Zare as to UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Waiver sent on 8/25/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Roach, Lonnie)
August 25, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
August 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13893856). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Melody Zare. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Roach, Lonnie) (Attachment 1 replaced and flattened on 8/25/2020) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zare v. UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: UNUM Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Dennis M. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melody Zare
Represented By: Lonnie Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?