Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Cartu et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: David Cartu, Joshua Cartu, Orlando Union Inc., Leeav Peretz, Jonathan Cartu, Nati Peretz, All Out Marketing Limited, BareIt Media LLC doing business as SignalPush, Ryan Masten and Blue Moon Investments Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00908
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 07:25
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Ryan Masten answer due 11/9/2020. (td)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion by Stefan Savic to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #15 Defendant Ryan Mastens Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant Ryan Masten shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 9, 2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Ryan Masten served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ezra L. Finkle for pro hac vice admission of Stefan Savic ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13990072) by on behalf of BareIt Media LLC, Ryan Masten. (Finkle, Ezra)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Ryan Masten. (Finkle, Ezra)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to David Cartu, Jonathan Cartu, Joshua Cartu. (td)
September 9, 2020 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (David Cartu, Jonathan Cartu, Joshua Cartu) (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to All Out Marketing Limited, Blue Moon Investments Ltd., Orlando Union Inc., Leeav Peretz, Nati Peretz. (td)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission as to BareIt Media LLC. Waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Sedrish, Benjamin)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ryan Masten. (td)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BareIt Media LLC. (td)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Ryan Masten (Pendleton, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. BareIt Media LLC d/b/a SignalPush (Pendleton, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (cj)
September 2, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
September 2, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief, Civil Monetary Penalties, and Other Equitable Relief (Filing fee $ 400.). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pendleton, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Cartu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cartu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Cartu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Union Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leeav Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Cartu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nati Peretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Out Marketing Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BareIt Media LLC doing business as SignalPush
Represented By: Stefan Savic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Masten
Represented By: Stefan Savic
Represented By: Ezra L. Finkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Moon Investments Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Streit
Represented By: Elizabeth N. Pendleton
Represented By: Benjamin Sedrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?