Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Honeysucker et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Adolphus Dominique Armstrong also known as Dominique Armstrong also known as Tracy Mac doing business as Ink Empire Tattoo Shop doing business as Ink Empire, Dominique Armstrong, Tracy Mac and Matilda R. Honeysucker doing business as Ink Empire Tattoo Shop doing business as Ink Empire
Case Number: 1:2020cv00964
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that JHP either (a) move for entry of default against Defendants or (b) file a status report on or before November 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Matilda R. Honeysucker served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (King, Jamie)
September 30, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Adolphus Dominique Armstrong served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (King, Jamie)
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Adolphus Dominique Armstrong, Matilda R. Honeysucker. (cj)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (King, Jamie)
September 17, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
September 17, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13979490), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(King, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Honeysucker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adolphus Dominique Armstrong also known as Dominique Armstrong also known as Tracy Mac doing business as Ink Empire Tattoo Shop doing business as Ink Empire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominique Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Mac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matilda R. Honeysucker doing business as Ink Empire Tattoo Shop doing business as Ink Empire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?