Kinney et al v. International Business Machines Corporation
Plaintiff: Michael Kelly, Charles Townlsey, Chris Mancuso, Constance Lewis, Michael Sauro, Nancy Kinney, Titon Hoque, Alvaro Paiz, Walter Noffsinger, Thanh Do, Paul Pham, Wilbert Talmadge, Sheri Parr, Rosa Davidson, Tom Kierl and Janet Gelphman
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00969
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:626
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses and Replies. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
November 2, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Defendants Motion to Compel Arbitration of ADEA Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss by Rosa Davidson, Thanh Do, Janet Gelphman, Titon Hoque, Michael Kelly, Tom Kierl, Nancy Kinney, Constance Lewis, Chris Mancuso, Walter Noffsinger, Alvaro Paiz, Sheri Parr, Paul Pham, Michael Sauro, Wilbert Talmadge, Charles Townlsey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coughlin, Heidi)
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 Partial ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint,, by International Business Machines Corporation.(Broadaway, Andrew)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by International Business Machines Corporation. (Broadaway, Andrew)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel Arbitration of ADEA Claims and Partial Motion to Dismiss by International Business Machines Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D. Kennedy - Declaration, #2 Exhibit Kennedy Decl. Ex. A - Kierl Agmt, #3 Exhibit Kennedy Decl. Ex. B - Kinney Agmt, #4 Exhibit Kennedy Decl. Ex. C - Lewis Agmt, #5 Exhibit Kennedy Decl. Ex. D - Paiz Agmt 1st, #6 Exhibit Kennedy Decl. Ex. E - Paize Agmt 2nd, #7 Exhibit Kennedy Decl. Ex. F - Parr)(Broadaway, Andrew)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction - Partial by International Business Machines Corporation. (Broadaway, Andrew)
October 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Paiz, Tom Kierl, Charles Townlsey, Nancy Kinney, Chris Mancuso, Michael Kelly, Michael Sauro, Janet Gelphman, Sheri Parr, Titon Hoque, Thanh Do, Wilbert Talmadge, Constance Lewis, Walter Noffsinger, Paul Pham, Rosa Davidson. All Defendants. (Coughlin, Heidi)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corporation. (lt)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rosa Davidson, Thanh Do, Janet Gelphman, Titon Hoque, Michael Kelly, Tom Kierl, Nancy Kinney, Constance Lewis, Chris Mancuso, Walter Noffsinger, Alvaro Paiz, Sheri Parr, Paul Pham, Michael Sauro, Wilbert Talmadge, Charles Townlsey. (Coughlin, Heidi)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Alvaro Paiz, Tom Kierl, Charles Townlsey, Nancy Kinney, Chris Mancuso, Michael Kelly, Michael Sauro, Sheri Parr, Titon Hoque, Thanh Do, Wilbert Talmadge, Constance Lewis, Walter Noffsinger, Paul Pham, Rosa Davidson, Janet Gelphman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Coughlin, Heidi) (Attachment 2 and 5 replaced on 10/8/2020 to rotate pages) (lt). Modified on 10/8/2020 (lt).
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alvaro Paiz, Tom Kierl, Charles Townlsey, Nancy Kinney, Chris Mancuso, Michael Kelly, Michael Sauro, Sheri Parr, Titon Hoque, Thanh Do, Wilbert Talmadge, Constance Lewis, Walter Noffsinger, Paul Pham, Rosa Davidson. All Defendants. (Coughlin, Heidi)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to International Business Machines Corporation. (cj)
September 18, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rosa Davidson, Thanh Do, Titon Hoque, Michael Kelly, Tom Kierl, Nancy Kinney, Constance Lewis, Chris Mancuso, Walter Noffsinger, Alvaro Paiz, Sheri Parr, Paul Pham, Michael Sauro, Wilbert Talmadge, Charles Townlsey. (cj)
September 18, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin (cj)
September 18, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Rosa Davidson, Thanh Do, Titon Hoque, Michael Kelly, Tom Kierl, Nancy Kinney, Constance Lewis, Chris Mancuso, Walter Noffsinger, Alvaro Paiz, Sheri Parr, Paul Pham, Michael Sauro, Wilbert Talmadge, Charles Townlsey. (Coughlin, Heidi)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13984682), filed by Alvaro Paiz, Tom Kierl, Charles Townlsey, Nancy Kinney, Chris Mancuso, Michael Kelly, Michael Sauro, Sheri Parr, Titon Hoque, Thanh Do, Wilbert Talmadge, Constance Lewis, Walter Noffsinger, Paul Pham, Rosa Davidson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #12 Summons)(Coughlin, Heidi) (Attachment 12 replaced and flattened on 9/21/2020) (cj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney et al v. International Business Machines Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kelly
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Townlsey
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Mancuso
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Lewis
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sauro
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Kinney
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Titon Hoque
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Paiz
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Noffsinger
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thanh Do
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Pham
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilbert Talmadge
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri Parr
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Davidson
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Kierl
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Gelphman
Represented By: Heidi A. Coughlin
Represented By: Blair J. Leake
Represented By: Austin Harris Kaplan
Represented By: Archie Carl Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Business Machines Corporation
Represented By: Edward M. Smith
Represented By: Andrew J. Broadaway
Represented By: Alan Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?