Texas NAACP v. Governor of Texas Greg Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Texas NAACP
Defendant: Texas Secretary of State, Governor of Texas Greg Abbott, Greg Abbott and Ruth Hughs
Case Number: 1:2020cv01024
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
October 16, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Texas NAACP (Notzon, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: TelephonicStatus Conference held on 10/15/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(cj)
October 15, 2020 Filing 20 APPENDIX to #19 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Sweeten, Patrick)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' response is limited to no more than 33 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (aa2)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs, re #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Texas NAACP (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
October 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation as to Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
October 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K. Sweeten on behalf of Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Ruth Hughs(pty:dft) (Sweeten, Patrick)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Ezra Rosenburg. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney John Powers. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney John Libby. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Deanna Barkett FitzGerald. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney John Montgomery. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
October 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Chatman Declaration in support of TRO and PI replacing [#7-1] by Texas NAACP (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chatman Amended Decl - clean, #2 Affidavit Chatman Amended Decl - redlined)(Notzon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Stephen Notzon for John Montgomery ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14053510) by on behalf of Texas NAACP. (Notzon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Stephen Notzon for John Libby ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14053491) by on behalf of Texas NAACP. (Notzon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Texas NAACP. All Defendants. (Notzon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Stephen Notzon for Deanna Barkett FitzGerald ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14049819) by on behalf of Texas NAACP. (Notzon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Stephen Notzon for John Powers ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14049804) by on behalf of Texas NAACP. (Notzon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Stephen Notzon for Ezra Rosenberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14049723) by on behalf of Texas NAACP. (Notzon, Robert)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Deanna Barkett FitzGerald, John Libby, John T. Montgomery, John Powers, and Ezra Rosenberg re: non-admitted status. (cj)
October 8, 2020 SUMMONS Returned Executed Greg Abbott served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020; Ruth Hughs served on 10/7/2020, answer due 10/28/2020. (cj) Modified to correct date served on both Summons on 10/9/2020 (cj).
October 7, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF regarding #6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Texas NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Chatman Decl., #2 Affidavit Bledsoe Decl., #3 Affidavit Henderson Decl., #4 Affidavit Lewis Decl., #5 Affidavit Robinson Decl.)(Notzon, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 Opposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Texas NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Notzon, Robert)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nickolas A. Spencer ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14046718) by on behalf of Texas NAACP. (Spencer, Nickolas)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 Pro Hac Vice Letters mailed to Nickolas Spencer, Ezra Rosenberg, John Libby, John Powers, John T. Montgomery and Deanna Barkett FitzGerald. (dl)
October 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, Ruth Hughs. (dl)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Nickolas A. Spencer. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jg)
October 6, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
October 6, 2020 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Austin. (dl)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Texas NAACP. (Notzon, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Of Voting Rights Violations ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-14043304). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Texas NAACP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Notzon, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas NAACP v. Governor of Texas Greg Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Secretary of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor of Texas Greg Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Hughs
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas NAACP
Represented By: Robert Stephen Notzon
Represented By: Nickolas A. Spencer
Represented By: John T. Montgomery
Represented By: Deanna Barkett FitzGerald
Represented By: John F. Libby
Represented By: Ezra D Rosenberg
Represented By: John M. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?