Chandler v. Montes et al
Plaintiff: Pete Edward Chandler
Defendant: Cindy A. Montes, Corpus Christi Parole Office, Wichita County Parole Division, Vanessa Lujuan, Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles and Robert Harkrider
Case Number: 1:2021cv00410
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Mark Lane
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Pete Edward Chandler. (cc3)
June 24, 2021 Filing 10 Certified Mail Receipt of #9 Report and Recommendations mailed to Pete Edward Chandler. (cc3)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Pete Edward Chandler. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of PETE EDWARD CHANDLER. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Pete Edward Chandler. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
June 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Mark Lane. Plaintiff shall pay the $402 filing fee or file a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis on or before July 12, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmj)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion and Obey order signed on 5/13/21 filed by Pete Edward Chandler. Motions referred to Judge Mark Lane. (cc3)
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Pete Edward Chandler. (cc3)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for plaintiff to submit application to proceed in forma pauperis on or before June 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Mark Lane. (Attachments: #1 application)(cc3) Modified on 5/13/2021 to correct Judge's name (cc3).
May 11, 2021 Filing 3 Case Opening Letter mailed to Pete Edward Chandler. (cj)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cj)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402 is DUE.), filed by Pete Edward Chandler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, Cover Letter, and Envelope)(cj)
May 10, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandler v. Montes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy A. Montes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpus Christi Parole Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita County Parole Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanessa Lujuan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Board of Pardons and Paroles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Harkrider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pete Edward Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?