Moreno v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Petra S Moreno
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00814
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Dustin M Howell
Referring Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petra S Moreno. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Honig, Ronald)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petra S Moreno. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/30/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Honig, Ronald)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petra S Moreno. Kilolo Kijakazi served on 9/27/2021, answer due 11/26/2021. (Honig, Ronald)
September 22, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT, filed by Petra S Moreno.(lt)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #1 Application to Proceed In forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiff's complaint without prepayment of fees or costs or giving security therefor. FURTHER ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall issue summons in this case. Plaintiff's attorney has requested that they serve the applicable summons and therefore the Court does not order the United States Marshals Service to attempt service on Defendant. Signed by Judge Dustin M. Howell. (lt)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Petra S Moreno. (Honig, Ronald)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin M. Howell. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Dustin M. Howell. (cj)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Petra S Moreno. (Honig, Ronald)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petra S Moreno. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Honig, Ronald)
September 15, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (cj)
September 15, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petra S Moreno
Represented By: Ronald D. Honig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?