Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jaitley et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Leena Jaitley also known as Ali Jaitley also known as Leena Patel doing business as OptionsbyPros doing business as Managed Option Trading, Ali Jaitley, Leena Patel, Taraben Patel and OTA LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00832
Filed: September 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Taraben Patel served on 10/9/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (Kisslinger, Paul)
October 5, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Securities and Exchange Commission as to Leena Jaitley. Waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021; OTA LLC. Waiver sent on 10/5/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Kisslinger, Paul)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Leena Jaitley. (cj)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kisslinger, Paul) (Main Document 2 replaced and flattened on 9/20/2021) (cj).
September 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kisslinger, Paul)
September 20, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)
September 20, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
September 20, 2021 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Securities and Exchange Commission. (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Jaitley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leena Jaitley also known as Ali Jaitley also known as Leena Patel doing business as OptionsbyPros doing business as Managed Option Trading
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ali Jaitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leena Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taraben Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Paul W. Kisslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?