Brooks et al v. Abbott et al
Plaintiff: Roy Charles Brooks, Felipe Gutierrez, Phyllis Goines, Eva Bonilla, Clara Faulkner, Deborah Spell and Beverly Powell
Defendant: Greg Abbott and John Scott
Case Number: 1:2021cv00991
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey V Brown
Referring Judge: Jerry E Smith
2 Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Consolidating Cases. This case is consolidated into lead case LULAC v. Abbott, No. 3:21-CV-00259 (W.D. Tex., El Paso Division). All future pleadings, motions, orother documents should be filed under that cause number. Signed by Judge David C Guaderrama. (lt)
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Thomas Thompson on behalf of Greg Abbott, John Scott. Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney William Thomas Thompson added to party John Scott(pty:dft) (Thompson, William)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick K. Sweeten on behalf of Greg Abbott, John Scott. Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party John Scott(pty:dft) (Sweeten, Patrick)
November 10, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Spell, Phyllis Goines, Beverly Powell, Felipe Gutierrez, Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner. John Scott served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Dunn, Chad)
November 10, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Spell, Phyllis Goines, Beverly Powell, Felipe Gutierrez, Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner. Greg Abbott served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (Dunn, Chad)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONSTITUING THREE-JUDGE COURT: Judge Jerry E. Smith, Circuit Judge, 5th Circuit Court of Appeals; Judge Lee Yeakel, U.S. District Court Judge; and Judge Jeffrey V. Brown, U.S. District Court Judge, Southern District of TX. Signed by Priscilla R. Owen, Chief Judge, United State Court of Appeals for the 5th Circuit.(jv2)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jv2)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell. (Dunn, Chad)
November 5, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from United States District Judge Lee Yeakel directed to Priscilla R. Owen, Chief Judge, United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit. (jv2)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #3 Jesse L. Gaine's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Mark P. Gaber's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiffs. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
November 3, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn (for Jessie Gaines) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15403521) by on behalf of Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell. (Dunn, Chad)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn (for Mark Gaber) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15403503) by on behalf of Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner, Phyllis Goines, Felipe Gutierrez, Beverly Powell, Deborah Spell. (Dunn, Chad)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15403288). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Deborah Spell, Phyllis Goines, Beverly Powell, Felipe Gutierrez, Eva Bonilla, Roy Charles Brooks, Clara Faulkner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunn, Chad)
November 3, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
November 3, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (cj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Abbott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Charles Brooks
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Gutierrez
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Goines
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Bonilla
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Faulkner
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Spell
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Powell
Represented By: K. Scott Brazil
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Jesse Gaines
Represented By: Mark P. Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Abbott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Scott
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?