Bilyeu et al v. Esparza et al
Plaintiff: Whitney Bilyeu, Mark Ash, Stephanie Berlin, Joe Burnes, Arthur Dibianca, Kevin Hale, Desarae Lindsey, Arthur Thomas, IV, Mark Tippetts and LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF TEXAS
Defendant: Jose A. Esparza and John B. Scott
Case Number: 1:2021cv01089
Filed: December 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jose A. Esparza, John B. Scott, re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Arthur Thomas, IV, Plaintiff Stephanie Berlin, Plaintiff Libertarian Party of Texas, Plaintiff Whitney Bilyeu, Plaintiff Mark Tippetts, Plaintiff Arthur Dibianca, Plaintiff Desarae Lindsey, Plaintiff Mark Ash, Plaintiff Kevin Hale, Plaintiff Joe Burnes (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed order denying preliminary injunction)(Scanlon, Cory)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Agreed Interim Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction shall not exceed 20 pages in length. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mplc)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #19 Joint Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order entered by Judge Robert Pitman. A scheduling order will follow separately reflecting the deadlines agreed to by the parties. IT IS ORDERED that all briefs addressed in the Court's forthcoming order shall not exceed ten pages in length. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mplc)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Mark Ash, Stephanie Berlin, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Arthur Dibianca, Kevin Hale, Libertarian Party of Texas, Desarae Lindsey, Arthur Thomas, IV, Mark Tippetts. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Jared)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Jose A. Esparza, John B. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scanlon, Cory)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan G. Kercher on behalf of Jose A. Esparza, John B. Scott. Attorney Ryan G. Kercher added to party Jose A. Esparza(pty:dft), Attorney Ryan G. Kercher added to party John B. Scott(pty:dft) (Kercher, Ryan)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (Dkt. 14), no later than January 28, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mplc)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Application for Preliminary Injunction by Jose A. Esparza, John B. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scanlon, Cory)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING on 2/24/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman.Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cc3)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mark Ash, Stephanie Berlin, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Arthur Dibianca, Kevin Hale, Libertarian Party of Texas, Desarae Lindsey, Arthur Thomas, IV, Mark Tippetts. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Jared)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint . Attorney Cory A. Scanlon added to party Jose A. Esparza(pty:dft), Attorney Cory A. Scanlon added to party John B. Scott(pty:dft) by Jose A. Esparza, John B. Scott.(Scanlon, Cory)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending, filed by Kevin Hale, Stephanie Berlin, Desarae Lindsey, Mark Tippetts, Mark Ash, Arthur Thomas, IV, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Libertarian Party of Texas, Arthur Dibianca.(LeBlanc, Jared)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 12/17/2021. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically) (Court Reporter Lily Reznik)(cc3)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, (Telephone Conference set for 12/17/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Robert Pitman). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Hale, Stephanie Berlin, Desarae Lindsey, Mark Tippetts, Mark Ash, Arthur Thomas, IV, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Libertarian Party of Texas, Arthur Dibianca. Jose A. Esparza served on 12/3/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (LeBlanc, Jared)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Hale, Stephanie Berlin, Desarae Lindsey, Mark Tippetts, Mark Ash, Arthur Thomas, IV, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Libertarian Party of Texas, Arthur Dibianca. John B. Scott served on 12/3/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (LeBlanc, Jared)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE Plaintiffs' Request for Status Conference by Mark Ash, Stephanie Berlin, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Arthur Dibianca, Kevin Hale, Libertarian Party of Texas, Desarae Lindsey, Arthur Thomas, IV, Mark Tippetts (LeBlanc, Jared)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Jose A. "Joe" Esparza. (cc3)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mark Ash, Stephanie Berlin, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Arthur Dibianca, Kevin Hale, Libertarian Party of Texas, Desarae Lindsey, Arthur Thomas, IV, Mark Tippetts. (LeBlanc, Jared)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jose A. Esparza, John B. Scott. (dl)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Parties by Mark Ash, Stephanie Berlin, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Arthur Dibianca, Kevin Hale, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF TEXAS, Desarae Lindsey, Arthur Thomas, IV, Mark Tippetts. (LeBlanc, Jared)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Mark Ash, Stephanie Berlin, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, Arthur Dibianca, Kevin Hale, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF TEXAS, Desarae Lindsey, Arthur Thomas, IV, Mark Tippetts. (LeBlanc, Jared) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/3/2021 to flatten image) (dl).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell. (dl)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief (Filing fee Paid $ 402. Receipt #0542-15489197). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Kevin Hale, Stephanie Berlin, Desarae Lindsey, Mark Tippetts, Mark Ash, Arthur Thomas, IV, Whitney Bilyeu, Joe Burnes, LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF TEXAS, Arthur Dibianca. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LeBlanc, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilyeu et al v. Esparza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Whitney Bilyeu
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Ash
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Berlin
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Burnes
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Dibianca
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hale
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desarae Lindsey
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Thomas, IV
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Tippetts
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBERTARIAN PARTY OF TEXAS
Represented By: Jared Gregory LeBlanc
Represented By: Adam J. Russ
Represented By: Brandon A. O'Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose A. Esparza
Represented By: Cory A. Scanlon
Represented By: Ryan G. Kercher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Scott
Represented By: Cory A. Scanlon
Represented By: Ryan G. Kercher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?