Facebook Inc. et al v. Houlihan Lokey, Inc.
Petitioner: Facebook Inc. and Instagram LLC
Respondent: Houlihan Lokey, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021mc00738
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alan D Albright
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #1 Complaint,,, Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by Facebook Inc., Instagram LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Paven Malhotra to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioners. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lt)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #18 Motion for Matthew M. Werdegar to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioners. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lt)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Eugene M. Paige to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioners. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lt)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion for David J. Silbert to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioners. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lt)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Christa M. Anderson to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petitioners. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lt)
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Paven Malhotra ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15173900) by on behalf of Facebook Inc., Instagram LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Matthew W. Werdegar ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15173688) by on behalf of Facebook Inc., Instagram LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Eugene M. Paige ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15173615) by on behalf of Facebook Inc., Instagram LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones on behalf of David J. Silbert ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15173602) by on behalf of Facebook Inc., Instagram LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Christa M. Anderson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15173581) by on behalf of Facebook Inc., Instagram LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E. Jones on behalf of Facebook Inc., Instagram LLC (Jones, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 13 Case Transfer and Opening Letter sent to all Counsel. (cj)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Orders Directing Christa M. Anderson, Paven Malhotra, Eugene M. Paige, David J. Silbert, and Matthew M. Werdegar to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cj)
August 25, 2021 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower (cj)
August 25, 2021 Case TRANSFERRED and assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cj)
August 25, 2021 Filing 11 Case electronically transferred in from Northern District of California; Case Number 3:21-mc-80192.
August 25, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Texas. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #7 Motion to Transfer Case; denying as moot #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and #4 Motion to Shorten Time. The Court HEREBY TRANSFERS this matter to the Western District of Texas, Austin Division. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 9 Statement of Non-Opposition re #7 MOTION to Transfer Case (Unopposed) filed byFacebook Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 8/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 Declaration of Sam Stake in Support of #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byHoulihan Lokey, Inc.. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Stake, Sam) (Filed on 8/19/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Transfer Case (Unopposed) filed by Houlihan Lokey, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 9/1/2021. Replies due by 9/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sam Stake, #2 Proposed Order)(Stake, Sam) (Filed on 8/18/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc., Instagram, LLC re #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #4 MOTION to Shorten Time for Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena, #1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening),, (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 8/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook Inc., Instagram, LLC re #2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , 3 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #4 MOTION to Shorten Time for Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena, #1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening),, (Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 8/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Shorten Time for Opposition to Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena filed by Facebook Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paven Malhotra, #2 Proposed Order)(Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 8/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/27/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 2 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Facebook Inc., Instagram, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paven Malhotra, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Motion to Compel, #4 Unredacted Motion to Compel, #5 Ex. C, #6 Ex. D, #7 Ex. E, #8 Ex. G, #9 Ex. H, #10 Ex. I, #11 Ex. J, #12 Ex. K, #13 Ex. L, #14 Ex. M, #15 Ex. N, #16 Ex. O, #17 Ex. P, #18 Ex. Q, #19 Ex. R, #20 Ex. S, #21 Ex. T, #22 Ex. U, #23 Ex. V, #24 Ex. W, #25 Ex. X)(Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 8/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]
August 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION TO COMPEL Compliance with Subpoena against Houlihan Lokey, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 49, receipt number 0971-16281044.). Filed by Instagram, LLC, Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paven Malhotra, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Proposed Order)(Malhotra, Paven) (Filed on 8/13/2021) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/25/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Facebook Inc. et al v. Houlihan Lokey, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: Christa M. Anderson
Represented By: David J. Silbert
Represented By: Eugene M. Paige
Represented By: Matthew M. Werdegar
Represented By: Michael E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Instagram LLC
Represented By: Paven Malhotra
Represented By: Christa M. Anderson
Represented By: David J. Silbert
Represented By: Eugene M. Paige
Represented By: Matthew M. Werdegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Houlihan Lokey, Inc.
Represented By: Sam Stake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?