Campaign Legal Center et al v. Scott
Plaintiff: Campaign Legal Center, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas, Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law and DEMOS a Network for Ideas and Action, LTD
Defendant: John B. Scott
Case Number: 1:2022cv00092
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1973 Voting Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #24 Pooja Chaudhuri's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawyers' Committee. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #23 Ezra Rosenberg's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Lawyers' Committee. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
March 23, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan of Pooja Chaudhuri ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15846320) by on behalf of Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
March 23, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Lindsey Beth Cohan of Ezra Rosenberg ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15846307) by on behalf of Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cohan, Lindsey)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING #21 Unopposed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' #21 Preliminary Injunction Motion. Response due 04/04/2022. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
March 17, 2022 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing with Trial on the Merits by John B. Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sweeten, Patrick)
March 7, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to Consolidate Preliminary Injunction Hearing with Trial on the Merits by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas, Campaign Legal Center, DEMOS a Network for Ideas and Action, LTD, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Caleb Jackson, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Ashley Harris, #3 Exhibit Ex. A - Texas Election Advisory 2019-02, #4 Exhibit Ex. B - Texas LULAC v. Whitley, Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Ex. C - Aug. 20, 2021 AG Letter, #6 Exhibit Ex. D - Sept. 14, 2021 AG Letter, #7 Exhibit Ex. E - Tarrant County DPS Proof of Citizenship List, #8 Exhibit Ex. F - Travis County DPS Proof of Citizenship List, #9 Exhibit Ex. G - Collin County DPS Proof of Citizenship List, #10 Exhibit Ex. H - Aug. 27, 2021 NVRA Demand for Documents, #11 Exhibit Ex. I - Sept. 14, 2021 SOS Response Letter, #12 Exhibit Ex. J - Oct. 20, 2021 NVRA Notice Letter, #13 Exhibit Ex. K - Oct. 20, 2021 NVRA Demand for Documents, #14 Exhibit Ex. L - Nov. 3, 2021 SOS Response Letter, #15 Exhibit Ex. M - Nov. 15, 2021 NVRA Notice Letter, #16 Exhibit Ex. N - Nov. 10, 2021 SOS Letter to AG re First Demand, #17 Exhibit Ex. O - Nov. 10, 2021 SOS Letter to AG re Second Demand)(Lang, Danielle)
March 4, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Buckley Disorbo on behalf of John B. Scott (Disorbo, Jack)
March 4, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Thomas Thompson on behalf of John B. Scott (Thompson, William)
February 28, 2022 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Patrick K. Sweeten added to party John B. Scott(pty:dft) by John B. Scott.(Sweeten, Patrick)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #3 Alice Huling's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Campaign Legal Center. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Fatima Menendez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff MALDEF, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
February 9, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Campaign Legal Center, Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas, DEMOS a Network for Ideas and Action, LTD. John B. Scott served on 2/7/2022, answer due 2/28/2022. (Perales, Nina)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion for Danielle M. Lang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Campaign Legal Center. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Molly Elizabeth Danahy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Campaign Legal Center. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt)
February 8, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales (For Fatima Menendez) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15691459) by on behalf of Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.. (Perales, Nina)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #8 Rosa Saavedra Vanacore's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff MALDEF, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #6 Caleb A. Jackson's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Campaign Legal Center. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (jv2)
February 2, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nina Perales (For Rosa Saavedra Vanacore) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15675573) by on behalf of Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.. (Perales, Nina)
February 2, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn (for Molly Elizabeth Danahy) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15674486) by on behalf of Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Bar Admissions, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
February 2, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn (for Caleb A. Jackson) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15674072) by on behalf of Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Bar Admissions, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
February 2, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to John B. Scott. (dl)
February 2, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn (for Danielle M. Lang) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15674052) by on behalf of Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Bar Admissions, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
February 2, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chad W. Dunn (for Alice C. C. Huling) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15673988) by on behalf of Campaign Legal Center. (Attachments: #1 Bar Admissions, #2 Proposed Order)(Dunn, Chad)
February 2, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas, Campaign Legal Center, DEMOS a Network for Ideas and Action, LTD, Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.. (Perales, Nina)
February 2, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl)
February 2, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane. (dl)
February 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15669827). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Campaign Legal Center, Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc., American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas, DEMOS a Network for Ideas and Action, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Perales, Nina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campaign Legal Center et al v. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Campaign Legal Center
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Caleb Jackson
Represented By: Chad W. Dunn
Represented By: Danielle M. Lang
Represented By: Molly Elizabeth Danahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Texas
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Alice Huling
Represented By: Andre I. Segura
Represented By: Ashley Alcantara Harris
Represented By: Thomas Paul Buser-Clancy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mexican American Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Rosa Saavedra Vanacore
Represented By: Fatima L Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights Under Law
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Ezra D. Rosenberg
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEMOS a Network for Ideas and Action, LTD
Represented By: Nina Perales
Represented By: Lindsey Beth Cohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B. Scott
Represented By: J. Aaron Barnes
Represented By: Jack Buckley Disorbo
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael White
Represented By: Patrick K. Sweeten
Represented By: William Thomas Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?