Bandy v. TRC Companies, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mr. Herman Bandy
Defendant: TRC Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00144
Filed: February 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert Pitman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the lack of opposition, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before April 20, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jalc)
March 30, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: TRC Companies, Inc. answer due 4/20/2022. (jv2)
March 29, 2022 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by TRC Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Richter, Patrick)
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patrick S. Richter on behalf of TRC Companies, Inc.. Attorney Patrick S. Richter added to party TRC Companies, Inc.(pty:dft) (Richter, Patrick)
February 18, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TRC Companies, Inc. (rn)
February 18, 2022 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Herman Bandy. (Assaad, Gabriel)
February 16, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
February 16, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Howell (rn)
February 16, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15723909). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Herman Bandy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Assaad, Gabriel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bandy v. TRC Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Herman Bandy
Represented By: Gabriel A. Assaad
Represented By: Galvin B. Kennedy
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Yezierski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRC Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick S. Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?