Palmer Cravens, LLC et al v. Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Palmer Cravens, LLC, Estate of Guy Hardy, Nora Finley, Dripping Springs Roofing and Estate of Guy Hardy as authorized by and through NORA FINLEY, the sole heir and representative doing business as Dripping Springs Roofing
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00327
Filed: April 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Docket - Austin
Referring Judge: Lee Yeakel
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Docket II - Austin for all proceedings. Judge Lee Yeakel no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
February 27, 2023 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC, re #12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16, #2 Exhibit 17)(Smith, David)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel.. Referral Magistrate Judge: Mark Lane. (pg)
February 17, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Estate of Guy Hardy, Palmer Cravens, LLC, re #12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Jones, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Ray Thomas, #3 Exhibit The Policy, #4 Exhibit June 6, 2017 letter, #5 Exhibit November 8, 2017 letter, #6 Exhibit January 29, 2018 letter, #7 Exhibit Dripping Springs Original Answer, #8 Exhibit March 14, 2018 email, #9 Exhibit March 19, 2018 letter, #10 Exhibit Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #11 Exhibit Final Judgment)(Jones, David)
January 30, 2023 Filing 13 Defendant's First Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC.(Cowart, Tracy)
January 27, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Smith, David)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 1/27/2023. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (pg)
January 18, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David West Smith on behalf of Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC. Attorney David West Smith added to party Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC(pty:dft) (Smith, David)
January 17, 2023 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lee Yeakel: Initial Pretrial Conference held by Telephone on 1/17/2023 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) Written Order Forthcoming. (Court Reporter Arlinda Rodriguez.)(pg)
January 16, 2023 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Parties by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC. (Cowart, Tracy)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference for 1/17/2023 3:30 PM in Austin before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (bot1)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 1/12/2023 03:30 PM by Telephone before Judge Lee Yeakel. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (pg)
August 15, 2022 Filing 5 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Estate of Guy Hardy, Palmer Cravens, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Jones, David)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 Miscellaneous Objection CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC. (Cowart, Tracy)
June 14, 2022 Filing 3 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, . Attorney Tracy Jackson Cowart added to party Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC(pty:dft) by Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC.(Cowart, Tracy)
May 2, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Palmer Cravens, LLC as to Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC. Waiver sent on 4/15/2022, answer due 6/14/2022. (Jones, David)
April 5, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rn)
April 5, 2022 If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Lane (rn)
April 5, 2022 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dripping Springs Roofing, Estate of Guy Hardy, Nora Finley, Palmer Cravens, LLC. (rn)
April 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15891171). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Palmer Cravens, LLC, Nora Finley, Estate of Guy Hardy, Dripping Springs Roofing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer Cravens, LLC et al v. Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Palmer Cravens, LLC
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Guy Hardy
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nora Finley
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dripping Springs Roofing
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Guy Hardy as authorized by and through NORA FINLEY, the sole heir and representative doing business as Dripping Springs Roofing
Represented By: David Watkin Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Contractors Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Jackson Cowart
Represented By: David West Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?